judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00805-CV
01-81-00805-CV
11/19/1981
Miscellaneous/other civil
High Point of Montgomery Corp.
Peter R. Vail et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/12/1983Petition for writ of error from trial courtRefused
09/24/1982Petition for writ of error from trial court
08/26/1982Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/06/1982Motion for rehearing filed
07/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/15/1982Supplemental brief filed
06/23/1982Submitted
06/23/1982Submission
06/23/1982Submitted
06/21/1982Supplemental brief filed
05/30/1982Submission
05/24/1982Brief filed
05/20/1982Supplemental transcript filed
04/30/1982Brief filed
02/18/1982Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/22/1982Exhibits filed
01/07/1982Statement of facts filed
11/19/1981Transcript filed
11/19/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
Trial Court Information