Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/06/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | | |
11/06/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 00-19473 |
11/06/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | | |
12/04/2000 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. | | 00-21186 |
12/29/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Deputy Daniel Wong has assumed reponsibility for representing the respondents. | | 00-22688 |
01/08/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On November 6, 2000, this court issued a notice to appellant to pay the filing fee. In response, appellant submitted a motion to remand this case to the district court for consideration of his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filed in district court on March 2, 2000. Respondents submitted an opposition to the motion, asserting that the district court denied the motion, and arguing that this appeal should be dismissed as frivolous. It does not appear from a review of the district court docket sheet and the district court minutes that the district court has ruled on appellant's motion. We therefore direct the district court to enter an order in compliance with NRAP 24 within 30 days from the date of this order, and to provide a copy of the order to this court. fn2[We defer ruling on respondents' request to dismiss this appeal as frivolous, pending receipt and review of the record in this case.] fn3[We note that a remand, as requested by appellant, is unnecessary, as the district court retains jurisdiction over matters collateral to this appeal, such as the motion for leave to appear in forma pauperis. This portion of appellant's motion is denied. Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] | | 01-00339 |
01/08/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Request to dismiss Appeal as Frivolous. | | 00-21186 |
03/15/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Directing District Court to Rule on Appellant's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. We direct the district court to enter an order in compliance with NRAP 24 within 30 days from the date of this order, and to provide a copy of the order to this court. fn2[We note that it appears that our earlier order may have been served on the wrong district judge. We direct the clerk of this court to include a copy of our January 8, 2001, order when providing a copy of this order to the district judge assigned to the underlying district court action.] fn3[As noted in our January 8 order, we defer ruling on respondents' requst to dismiss this appeal as frivolous, pending receipt and review of the record in this case.] | | 01-04587 |
03/22/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Since entry of our order of March 15, 2001, it has come to the attention of the court that the senior district judge assigned to this case has not been in the office for six weeks. We hereby extend the due date established by our order of March 15, 2001. The district court shall have 60 days from the date of this order to enter an order ruling on appellant's motion for leave to proceed in ofrma pauperis and to provide a copy of the order of this court. | | 01-05093 |
03/22/2001 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 5/5/00. (Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is Denied). | | 01-05105 |
01/10/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Directing Payment of Filing Fee. On November 14, 2000, Duff moved this court to remand this case to allow the district court to rule upon the in forma pauperis motion. On March 22, 2001, we received a copy of the district court's order denying Duff's motion, apparently because he failed to designate his current income. Duff shall have 20 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee required by NRS 2.250. If Duff is unable to pay the filing fee, he may submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to pay the filing fee, or to submit a properly supported motion within 20 days from the date of this order, may result in the dismissal of this appeal. | | 02-00717 |
01/30/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Tyrone Duff - money order no. 06-44139909. | | |
06/11/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn2[NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings).] fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | | 02-10152 |
06/27/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | | 02-11106 |
06/27/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
05/07/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG | | 03-07764 |
05/22/2003 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing before Chief Justice Agosti on the Order of Affirmance filed May 7, 2003. | | 03-08674 |
05/22/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | | |
05/22/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (for rehearing) Due Date: 10 days | | |
05/29/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Tyrone Duff-Money Order No. 06-017044169. | | |
06/18/2003 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c). Although appellant was not granted leave to proceed in proper person under NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered his proper person documents. We direct the clerk of this court to file the rehearing petition, provisionally received on May 22, 2003.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG | | 03-10225 |
06/18/2003 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing before Chief Justice Agosti on the Order of Affirmance filed May 7, 2003. | | 03-08674 |
07/15/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. | | 03-10371 |
07/15/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/31/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 16, 2003. | | 03-10371 |