Case: 04-81-00429-CV
04-81-00429-CV
11/19/1981
Miscellaneous civil
In Re: Estate of Lois Bascom Roberts
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/18/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/18/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/21/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/21/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/22/1983 | Submission | | |
02/22/1983 | Submission | | |
02/22/1983 | Submitted | | |
03/05/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/05/1982 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
03/05/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/07/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
12/17/1981 | Brief Filed | | |
11/19/1981 | No Description Available. | | |
11/19/1981 | No Description Available. | | |
11/19/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/18/1983 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Bexar
Honorable James C. Onion
156,501
n/a