Case: 13-94-00535-CV
13-94-00535-CV
11/10/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Robbins, Milton A.
Three Rivers Executive Inn, A Partnership, Mahendra Govind a/k/a John Govind, and Mukund Govind a/k/a Mike Govind, Individually and as Partners of Three Rivers Executive Inn
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/19/1998 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/14/1998 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
10/14/1998 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
09/16/1997 | Exhibits Checked Out | | |
08/25/1997 | Letter filed | | |
08/14/1997 | Exhibits Checked Out | | |
08/13/1997 | Letter filed | | |
08/07/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/05/1997 | Record returned to Court. | | |
06/12/1997 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
04/18/1997 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/02/1996 | Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court | | |
12/02/1996 | Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court | | |
11/18/1996 | Writ Filed | | |
11/18/1996 | Writ of Error Fee Paid | | |
11/15/1996 | Writ Filed | | |
11/15/1996 | Writ of Error Fee Paid | | |
10/17/1996 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
10/17/1996 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
10/03/1996 | Motion to extend time to file rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/01/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Additional Copies | | |
09/30/1996 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/30/1996 | Motion for rehearing | | |
09/30/1996 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/30/1996 | Motion for rehearing | | |
09/20/1996 | Extension of time to file Mo. for Rehear | | |
09/05/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
01/04/1996 | Submitted | | |
01/04/1996 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
01/04/1996 | Submission | | |
11/10/1995 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
11/10/1995 | Submission | | |
10/19/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/18/1995 | Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT | | |
10/03/1995 | Affidavit Filed | | |
09/29/1995 | Motion to Reset submission | | |
09/13/1995 | Letter sent | | |
09/05/1995 | Submission | | |
05/15/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
05/15/1995 | No oral argument requested | | |
04/27/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/19/1995 | Affidavit Filed | | |
04/17/1995 | Additional copies of motion for extension of time | | |
04/12/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/20/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
03/20/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/20/1995 | Oral argument requested | | |
02/23/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/17/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |
02/17/1995 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
02/17/1995 | Exhibits received | | |
02/17/1995 | STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED | | |
02/08/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
11/23/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/23/1994 | Statement Filed | | |
11/22/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
11/18/1994 | Statement Filed | | |
11/17/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
11/17/1994 | Transcript Received | | |
11/10/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
11/10/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
11/10/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/07/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robbins, Milton A. | Appellant | Harry J. Schulz Harry J. Schulz, Jr. |
Three Rivers Executive Inn, A | Appellee | Kevin M. Warburton Christopher M. Cain William Lewis Sessions |
Trial Court Information
156th District Court
Live Oak
Honorable Rachel Littlejohn
7246-B