judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAILYN RONNIE WARREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-17-0180)
Case Number:S-17-0180Case Docketed On:07/27/2017
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAILYN RONNIE WARREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAILYN RONNIE WARREN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDailyn Ronnie WarrenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
Christyne Marie Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/27/2017Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/27/2017Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/27/2017Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/05/2017Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/06/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2017Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/26/2017Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/27/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2017Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/30/2017Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal