judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-81-00164-CR
12-81-00164-CR
11/23/1981
Rape
Wright, Lawrence Lee
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1984
11/05/1984Mandate Issued
10/03/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/17/1984
03/22/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/13/1984motion for rehearing filed
02/29/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/06/1984Letter from the Court
01/26/1984Submitted
10/27/1983Submission
10/20/1983Submission
10/27/1982Brief Filed
09/27/1982Brief Filed
07/01/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/25/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1982Letter from the Court
02/18/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/07/1982
11/23/1981
06/12/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1984Case StoredCase stored
11/09/1984RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
10,077
50 years