judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NAPOLEON, MONTE CARLOS HEARD, ISOM

Case Information: 80-CV-1431
Short Caption:NAPOLEON, MONTE CARLOS HEARD, ISOMClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14679-79Filed Date:12/05/1980

Opening Event Date:12/05/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/17/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/20/1982
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NAPOLEON, MONTE CARLOS HEARD, ISOM
12/05/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/17/1982FiledRecord Completed
10/20/1982FiledBriefing Completed
12/07/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/26/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition