judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHARON VS. SCHWARTZ

Case Information: 34678
Short Caption:SHARON VS. SCHWARTZCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34089
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A376289Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Leavitt for Senior Justice YoungPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/14/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Yehuda Sharon--check no. 1192.
08/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07689
08/18/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-09385
10/12/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record on Appeal, Volume 7 filed in Case No. 34678. Letter from the district court clerk: this record comprises supplemental volume seven to volumes one through six previously sent to the Supreme Court under Case No. 34089. (These cases are not consolidated). Mailed on 10/08/99. 99-09892
10/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/05/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Substitution of Attorneys. Frank J. Cremen in place and stead of Lionel Sawyer & Collins as counsel for respondent. 99-10934
02/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to the Clark County Clerk: transmit to this court the Motion for Entry of Judgment by Default filed on June 4, 1999, including the attached affidavit of Rea Melanson and 18 exhibits to the affidavit. Nos. 34089, 34678. 00-01648
02/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of Motion for Entry of Judgment by Default with attached affidavits and exhibit filed in district court on June 4, 1999 (as requested in this court's order filed 2/1/00). Nos. 34089, 34678. 00-02255
10/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. 00-19124
11/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 34089) and Directing Response (Docket No. 34678). fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] In Docket No. 34089, respondents have moved to dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The March 4, 1999, judgment appealed from was not a final judgment, and appellant's notice of appeal was prematurely filed. We grant respondents' motion to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 34089. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." Having reviewed the record before this court, it appears that a partial response is warranted in Docket No. 34678. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a limited response, including points and authorities, addressing why the portion of the district court's order awarding attorney's fees and costs should not be reversed. SNP00A-WM/ML/NB Nos. 34089 and 34678-cases are not consolidated. 00-20886
12/28/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondents' Response Pursuant to the Court's November 30, 2000, Order. 00-22650
12/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. On November 30, 2000, this court dismissed the appeal in docket No. 34089. Volumes 1 through 6 of the record filed in Docket No. 34089 were not transferred to the instant appeal but were inadvertently returned to the dustody of the district court clerk with the remittitur issued in that appeal. We direct the clerk of the district court to re-certify and re-transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, Volumes 1 through 6 of the trial court record. 01-21547
01/14/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 6, volumes 8 and 9 (Volume 7 was filed on October 12, 1999). 02-00920
01/14/2002Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. on Record.
03/07/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 02-04115
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 9 this day. 02-04184
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2002. 02-04184