judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOEL RANDY FERGUSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-171)
Case Number:06-171Case Docketed On:07/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JOEL RANDY FERGUSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOEL RANDY FERGUSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoel Randy FergusonD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 157
Citation:168 P.3d 476

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/23/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/07/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
01/08/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
02/15/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/27/2007Record - Supplemental record on appeal; transcript of June 3, 2005 arraignment proceedingsRecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
04/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/13/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions and Verdict; Volume III - IV, Transcritps; Volume V, Confidential FolderRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2007System - Record checked-in - returned from Judge ArnoldSystemRecord checked-inFinal
10/04/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/22/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/22/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/24/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/23/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal