judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ED F. AYCOCK, JR. v. JEROME A. CURTIS AND THERESA H. CURTIS

Case: A-213
A-213
06/02/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ED F. AYCOCK, JR.
JEROME A. CURTIS AND THERESA H. CURTIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/13/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/12/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/14/1944Motion for Rehearing
10/18/1944Response to Motion filed
10/13/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/12/1944Response to Petition
06/02/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/02/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerome A. Curtis and Theresa H. CurtisRespondent
Ed F. Aycock, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information