judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRAUNSTEIN (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36948
Short Caption:BRAUNSTEIN (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37685 , 37760 , 40667 , 40678 , 40873 , 40958 , 40967 , 41725 , 43404 , 45863 , 49565 , 49569 , 69312 , 69512 , 70392 , 70392-COA , 70434 , 73170 , 73170-COA , 75038 , 75038-COA , 76788 , 76788-COA , 77331 , 78128 , 79894 , 79894-COA , 80184 , 80184-COA , 80251 , 81481 , 82230
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158840Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/03/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 00-19368
12/06/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/13/00; 6/14/00; 7/24/00. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn and Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: 12/4/00. 00-21299
12/12/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 14, 2000 and July 24, 2000. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-21692
12/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21940
12/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 00-22067
12/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days. 00-22178
01/11/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-00677
01/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/13/00. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 01-01185
01/26/2001Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Regarding representation of counsel. (Nos. 36714 and 36948).
02/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On January 11, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a response to this court's order to show cause. We conclude that we lack jurisdiction to entertain this appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-02684
03/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02906
03/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02906