Case Information: 83-CM-1022 | |||
Short Caption: | COATES, WARREN JAY UNITED STATES | Classification: | Miscellaneous Filings - Miscellaneous Proceedings - BG Bar related matter |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M7758-82 | Filed Date: | 07/26/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/26/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/16/1987 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/09/1988 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/15/1988 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/09/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | COATES, WARREN JAY UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 3/13/87 ORD: GRANT MO FOR LV NOTE - 01 TO W/D COUNSEL RALPH J. NOTE - 02 PERROTTA & APPT MATTHEW LEEFER NOTE - 02 TO REPRESENT APLT ON THIS NOTE - 03 APPEAL; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 NOTE - 03 DAYS. | |||
01/01/1904 | JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y | |||
01/01/1906 | PERROTTAR VACATED 3/16/87 | |||
07/26/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/26/1983 | RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 092683 SCHPRD R | |||
11/04/1983 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/31/1986 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (152 PGS - MOORE III) JB PANEL SCDATE 111086 SCHPRD SR | |||
01/20/1987 | ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NO APLT BR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122386 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/09/1987 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL (LETTER) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/16/1987 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/16/1987 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021987 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
03/16/1987 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/01/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD BA | |||
11/02/1987 | ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT | |||
12/11/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 16TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BA | |||
12/24/1987 | ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE W/IN 30 DAYS-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD EBP | |||
01/25/1988 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/23/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/30/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE | |||
03/30/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/29/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD BE | |||
04/12/1988 | ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/29/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040688 SCHPRD V | |||
04/28/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 9TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 042988 SCHPRD BE | |||
05/06/1988 | ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRFTO 5/9/88-ANFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD V | |||
05/09/1988 | APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD BE | |||
05/09/1988 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
08/04/1988 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (33 PGS RT - TANNER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/15/1988 | SUBMITTED PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/15/1988 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/18/1988 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/18/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
12/09/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |