Case: 04-82-00337-CR
04-82-00337-CR
11/24/1981
Robbery
Mohr, Dod Vincent
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/15/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/15/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/25/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/25/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/05/1983 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
09/15/1983 | Submission | | |
09/15/1983 | Submitted | | |
07/14/1983 | Appeal Reinstated | | |
07/14/1983 | Order Entered | | |
06/20/1983 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |
12/13/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
12/13/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/15/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/08/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/12/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/05/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
09/29/1982 | Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late) | | |
09/21/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/10/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/16/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/10/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/12/1982 | Record Filed | | |
07/12/1982 | Record Approved | | |
07/12/1982 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/24/1981 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David Peeples
81-CR-2267
Five (5) years