judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01235-CR
05-81-01235-CR
11/24/1981
Assault
David Lake
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/2017Order enteredDestroy
12/15/2016Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
02/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/21/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lake, DavidCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Grayson
Honorable Grayson County Judge, County Court At Law No. 1
81-1766
6 months jail, $1250 fine, probated