judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00275-CR
08-81-00275-CR
11/23/1981
Theft
Chavez, Adolfo Cornejo
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
01/06/1983Mandate Issued
10/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/04/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
12/11/1981Brief Filed
11/23/1981Brief Filed
11/23/1981Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/06/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
65th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Edward Marquez
34473-65
Life