judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN GEORGE TUTTLE, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-19-0083)
Case Number:S-19-0083Case Docketed On:04/25/2019
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KEVIN GEORGE TUTTLE, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEVIN GEORGE TUTTLE, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin George Tuttle Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBridget L. Hill
Jenny Lynn Craig
Christyne Marie Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/25/2019Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/25/2019Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/25/2019Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/07/2019Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/10/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/10/2019Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/14/2019Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/17/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2019Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/17/2019Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal