judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00436-CV
04-81-00436-CV
11/23/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Department of Public Safety
Beauchamp, Jr., Douglas Bo
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
10/26/1982Mandate Issued
08/31/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/25/1982Waives Oral Argument
01/22/1982Brief Filed
01/22/1982Case ready to be set
01/11/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/31/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/28/1981Brief Filed
12/28/1981Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
11/23/1981No Description Available.
11/23/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/22/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
10/22/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Bexar
Honorable Fred Biery
136,526