judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00188-CR
10-81-00188-CR
11/24/1981
Theft From Person
Victor Watkins a/k/a Steve Parker
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/10/1982Case stored
11/10/1982Mandate issued by this Court
09/09/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/12/1982Submitted
11/24/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-512-C
10 Years