judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Tamayo, Audrey G. v. Valdez, Hon. Rogelio, Judge of the 357th District Court of Cameron County, Texas

Case: 13-97-00440-CV
13-97-00440-CV
08/04/1997
Mandamus
Tamayo, Audrey G.
Valdez, Hon. Rogelio, Judge of the 357th District Court of Cameron County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
06/18/2019Case stored
08/19/1997Motion for Leave to File MandamusMotion or Writ Denied
08/18/1997Response to _____________.
08/18/1997Response to _____________.
08/11/1997Filing Fee Paid
08/04/1997Motion for Leave to File Writ of Mandamus
08/04/1997Writ (General) RECEIVED
08/04/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/19/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tamayo, Audrey G.RelatorHon. R. W. Armstrong
Valdez, Judge, Hon. Rogelio OfAny JudgeHon. Rogelio Valdez
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Rogelio Valdez
95-10-5967-E