Case: 04-81-00437-CV
04-81-00437-CV
11/23/1981
Miscellaneous civil
In Re: Estate of Herman Ishmael Tiley, by & Through Administ
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/14/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/14/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/27/1983 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/27/1983 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/21/1983 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
01/10/1983 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/08/1982 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
07/06/1982 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
07/02/1982 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
06/29/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/28/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
06/28/1982 | Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late) | | |
06/28/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/09/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
05/21/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
05/13/1982 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/21/1982 | No Description Available. | | |
04/14/1982 | No Description Available. | | |
11/30/1981 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/24/1981 | No Description Available. | | |
11/23/1981 | No Description Available. | | |
11/23/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/20/1981 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/14/1983 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James A. Mckay, Jr.
80-CI-10522