Case Information: 83-CM-1054 | |||
Short Caption: | BATES, ROBERT UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M5903-83 | Filed Date: | 08/31/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/31/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/27/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/20/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/11/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/22/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BATES, ROBERT UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 022984 ORD: GRANT MOT OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO WITHDRAW NOTE - 02 APPOINTMENT OF DIANE FENER; NOTE - 02 APPOINTING PDS;BRIEF OF APLT NOTE - 03 TO BE FILED IN 40 DAYS. FORMER NOTE - 03 COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO TRANSMT NOTE - 04 ALL PAPERS INCLUDING RT TO NOTE - 04 NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 84/12/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LYMANJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FACCIOLAJ FOR - APPELLEE | |||
01/01/1906 | FENERD VACATED-2/29/84 | |||
08/31/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/04/1983 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/08/1983 | RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC)GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/26/1984 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (103 PGS - HOLLAND)(RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 011884 SCHPRD RT | |||
01/27/1984 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/29/1984 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 ACG PANELNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/02/1984 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF ADDT'L TRANSCRIPT NO OPPO SL PANEL SCDATE 040984 SCHPRD BA | |||
04/09/1984 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (17 PGS - HOLLAND)(RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 060184 SCHPRD RT | |||
04/17/1984 | STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 4/10/84 RE TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/30/1984 | PDS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF BRIEF ATTACHED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/30/1984 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/19/1984 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF SED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/19/1984 | ORDER GRANT APLNT MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF;CLK TO FILE LODGED BRIEF;APPLE BRIEF DUE 7/29. SD PANELNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/27/1984 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (7 PGS - SALAZER) GG PANEL SCDATE 051784 SCHPRD RT | |||
06/27/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/18/1984 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/20/84 PANEL SCDATE 072984 SCHPRD BE | |||
08/20/1984 | APPELEE'S BRIEF DS PANEL SCDATE 082084 SCHPRD BE | |||
08/20/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/06/1984 | APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/15/1984 | LETTER GRANTING APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/11/1984 | ARGUED PANELPY BE TE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/11/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/15/1987 | ORDER SS, THIS APPEAL IS HELD IN ABEYANCE PENDG DECISION IN ROSE V. U.S.,NO. 85-111. DAS PANELPYBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/29/1988 | REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV APLT's CONVICTION/ CASE RM w/DIRECTIONS TO ENTER/ JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL PANELPYBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/29/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 537 A.2d 1131 | |||
02/29/1988 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0341 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 0000 | |||
03/22/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |