Case: 04-81-00443-CR
04-81-00443-CR
11/24/1981
Assault or Attempted Murder
Mohr, Dod Vincent
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/15/1984 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
03/15/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/15/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/25/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/25/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/13/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/13/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/13/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
12/13/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/15/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/08/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/12/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | | |
10/05/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
09/29/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
09/23/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
09/21/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/10/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/13/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/12/1982 | Record Filed | | |
07/12/1982 | Record Approved | | |
06/03/1982 | No Description Available. | Filing is Moot | |
06/03/1982 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/26/1982 | No Description Available. | | |
04/15/1982 | No Description Available. | | |
03/08/1982 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/03/1982 | No Description Available. | | |
01/29/1982 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/22/1982 | No Description Available. | | |
11/24/1981 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/24/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-2266
5 Years