Case Information: 36953 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE, DMV VS. STEIMER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411671 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/09/2000 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/07/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/03/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/03/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-19398 | |
11/09/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
11/14/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The matter involves DMV License Revocation. Attorneys for the Appellant & Respondent are both strongly opposed to a settlement conference. After review, Settlement Judge feels that this case should be taken out of the settlement program. | 00-19935 | |
11/21/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 00-20476 | |
11/27/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Notice of correct address for Deputy Attorney General Jean S. Moriki. | 00-20643 | |
11/27/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
12/01/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 31, 2000. To Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. | 00-21041 | |
12/05/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-21200 | |
12/28/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 7/31/00. Court Reporter: Debra Van Blaricom. | 00-22631 | |
03/22/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 03/21/01. | 01-05049 | |
03/22/2001 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 01-05051 | |
04/19/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/18/01. | 01-06700 | |
05/21/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 05/18/01. | 01-08358 | |
05/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | ||
11/07/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 01-18616 | |
11/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML | ||
01/02/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-00016 | |
01/18/2002 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: January 16, 2002. | 02-01327 | |
03/15/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. We conclude that rehearing is not warranted under NRAP 40 (c). "We deny the petition." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-04710 | |
04/01/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-04851 | |
04/01/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/24/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2002. | 02-04851 |