Case: 05-97-01610-CV
05-97-01610-CV
09/22/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Alpha Pay Phones, Ltd. III and Alpha Liquidation Compnay, LLC
Mankoff, Hill, Held & Metzger, Billy B. Hill, Jr., Monte Bond, and M. Bruce Peele
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
09/20/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
09/20/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/07/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/14/2000 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
06/14/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
05/30/2000 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct. | | ||
05/30/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
05/30/2000 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct. | | ||
05/26/2000 | Submission | | |||
05/26/2000 | Submitted | | |||
11/15/1999 | Submitted | | |||
10/15/1999 | Submission | | |||
10/15/1999 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
10/07/1999 | Order Entered | | |||
02/01/1998 | Brief Due | | |||
01/30/1998 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/30/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/30/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/02/1998 | Brief Filed | | |||
12/31/1997 | Brief Due | | |||
12/12/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/12/1997 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
12/12/1997 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
12/08/1997 | Notice to appellant that brief is late | | |||
12/05/1997 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
12/05/1997 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
12/02/1997 | Response to Motion | | |||
12/01/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/28/1997 | Brief Due | | |||
10/29/1997 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
10/18/1997 | Record due | | |||
10/08/1997 | Letter Filed | | |||
09/29/1997 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
09/29/1997 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |||
09/22/1997 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
09/22/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
09/18/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
07/21/1997 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
06/20/1997 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/06/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
05/29/2006 | Status | Destroy record |
09/20/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mankoff, Hill Held & Metzger, | Appellee | Marshall Troy Murrell |
Alpha Pay Phones, Ltd. Iii And | Appellant | Michael A. Dover |
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
95-12335-L