judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPAIR, JR. (STEPHEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34047
Short Caption:SPAIR, JR. (STEPHEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135598Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-02946
04/28/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-03351
04/28/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-03352
08/10/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-07373
08/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-07375
09/02/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-08234
10/01/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-09420
12/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for the entry of a new, valid amended judgment of conviction." fn1[We note that should appellant wish to challenge any subsequent judgment of conviction, appellant must file a new, timely notice of appeal in accordance with NRAP 4(b)]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-13203
01/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01160
01/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2000. 00-01160