judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LULING OIL AND GAS COMPANY v. HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY

Case: A-193
A-193
05/24/1944
Application for Writ of Error
LULING OIL AND GAS COMPANY
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/21/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/28/1944Returned document(s). See Remarks.
06/21/1944Reply to Response
06/13/1944Response to Petition
06/05/1944Bond
05/30/1944Response to Motion filed
05/25/1944Motion to dismissFiling granted
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Luling Oil and Gas CompanyPetitioner
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information