judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENT A. KING v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (06-114)
Parent:06-114Case Docketed On:04/24/2006
Consolidated: 06-252
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:KENT A. KING v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:KENT A. KING, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKent A. KingRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 109
Citation:161 P.3d 1086

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/05/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/11/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/21/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/01/2006Response/Objection - Motion appellee's motion to dismiss. (Untimely--filed three days late.)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/06/2006Order - Denying, without prejudice, motion to dismiss appeal.OrderDenyFinal
09/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/08/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/15/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/18/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/25/2007Order - Consolidating cases. Case no. 06-252 consolidated with 06-114 for purposes of decision.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/12/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/02/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 8/1/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal