judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEUTSCH (SCOTT) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 31980
Short Caption:DEUTSCH (SCOTT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR95P1441Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/06/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
04/01/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
04/14/1998Other Returned Unfiled Document. (not a fast track appeal).
07/21/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
07/21/1998BriefReceived Opening Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Messenger 7/21/98-two copies returned).
07/21/1998AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Messenger 7/21/98-three copies returned.
07/23/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on July 21, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith.
07/23/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief.
07/23/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
08/25/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 24, 1998.
09/15/1998BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 9/14/98.
11/06/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, neither the appellant nor respondent has submitted a copy of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing conducted by the district court on June 7, 1997, and August 1, 1997, as required by NRAP 10(b). Both parties reply on and cite to this transcript in their briefs. Therefore, appellant shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file a supplemental appendix including the evidentiary hearing transcript.
05/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief.
01/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We order counsel for appellant to show, within 20 days, why sanctions for his flagrant disregard of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure should not be imposed. Having considered appellant's contention, " . . . we affirm the district court order denying appellant's petition for a writ of habeas corpus." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-00273
01/31/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00649
01/31/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/31/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-02111
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2001. 01-00649
03/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 5, 2001, this court directed counsel for appellant to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for counsel's failure to adhere to the nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Counsel has now responded to this court's order. In light of counsel's explanation, we decline to impose sanctions at this time. In the future this court expects counsel to pursue his obligations " in a manner meeting high standards of diligence, professionalism, and competence." 01-04111