Case: B-1489
B-1489
04/14/1969
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM G. BURNS, DBA INTERNATIONAL ADVERTISING AGENCY
ARTURO C. GONZALES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/16/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/15/1969 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
04/24/1969 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/14/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/28/1969 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/16/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/15/1969 | Reply to Response | | ||
04/24/1969 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/14/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
04/14/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
William G. Burns, dba International Advertising Agency | Petitioner | |
Arturo C. Gonzales | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information