Case Information: 84-CV-0569 | |||
Short Caption: | CLEARWATERS, KEITH I. POMERANZ, MORTON | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 84-CV-0491 | Consolidated: | 84-CV-0569 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA7632-82 | Filed Date: | 04/20/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/20/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/27/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 09/10/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/14/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CLEARWATERS, KEITH I. POMERANZ, MORTON | |||
04/20/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
06/27/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
09/10/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
12/14/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/08/1985 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |