Case Information: 34043 | |||
Short Caption: | DAIRYLAND INSURANCE VS. SHARPE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392694 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/23/1999 / Backus, Leland | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/04/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kenneth R. Bick--check no. 10731. | ||
04/14/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-02896 | |
04/22/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-03140 | |
04/23/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leland Eugene Backus. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/03/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement conference is scheduled for June 16, 1999 at the hour of 9:00 a.m. | 99-04630 | |
06/28/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-05656 | |
07/09/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. | 99-06079 | |
08/25/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Re: Jurisdiction. Response due: 30 days. | 99-07953 | |
09/07/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 99-08327 | |
10/13/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Schedule. We conclude that appellant has demonstrated that the district court's order was amenable to certification and that jurisdiction in this court is thus proper. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening biref and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 99-09901 | |
10/20/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Rule 9(a) Certification Regarding Transcript. | 99-10247 | |
02/02/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/2/00 (Reno/Carson). | 00-01635 | |
02/02/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 00-01636 | |
02/22/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/17/00. | 00-02738 | |
03/15/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/15/00 (Reno/Carson). | 00-04059 | |
08/28/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | 00-15038 | |
08/28/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/04/2001 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: SNP02-CY/DA/ML. | ||
11/09/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand with Instructions. "ORDER the judgment of the district court granting summary judgment to Sharpe REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to grant Dairyland's motion for summary judgment." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-18773 | |
12/05/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-19154 | |
12/05/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. | 01-19154 |