Case Information: 84-CV-0620 | |||
Short Caption: | ROGER H. CORLEY V. ALAN I. HERMAN | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA0860-84 | Filed Date: | 04/19/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/19/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/22/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 10/16/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/31/1985 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Roger H. Corley | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Alan I. Herman | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CORLEY, ROGER H. HERMAN, ALAN I. ET AL | |||
04/19/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
05/22/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
10/16/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/31/1985 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/12/1985 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |