Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/01/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from The Law Offices of Marshal S. Willick, P.C.--check no. 12079. | | |
12/01/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | | 00-21012 |
12/01/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | | |
12/07/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | | |
12/08/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: December 5, 2000. Nos. 37082/36969 (cases are not consolidated.) | | 00-21494 |
02/13/2001 | Other | Other. Filed Copy of Request for Summary Disposition of an Uncontested Divorce filed in the District Court on August 7, 1998 (via fax). Nos. 37082/36969 (cases are not consolidated.) | | 01-02894 |
02/14/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Clark County Clerk requesting copy of Request for Summary Disposition of an Uncontested Divorce filed in the District Court on August 7, 1998. | | 01-02942 |
02/20/2001 | Other | Other. Filed Certified Copy of Request for Summary Disposition of an Uncontested Divorce filed in the District Court on August 7, 1998. Nos. 37082/36969 (cases are not consolidated.) | | 01-03125 |
02/20/2001 | Other | Other. Filed Certified Copy of Affiavit of Plaintiff filed in the District Court on August 7, 1998. Nos. 37082/36969 (cases are not consolidated.) | | 01-03126 |
02/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: August 26, 1998. Nos. 37082/36969 (cases are not consolidated.) | | 01-03128 |
02/20/2001 | Other | Other. Filed certified copy of Affidavit of Resident Witness filed in the District Court on August 7, 1998. Nos. 37082/36969 (cases are not consolidated.) | | 01-03130 |
02/22/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. | | |
02/27/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Marshal S. Willick, Rawlings firm, and Dempsey firm: on February 14, 2001, this court requested the clerk of the district court to certify and transmit copies of documents for the appeal in (erroneously noted) No. 37082. On February 13, 2001, the court received from the district court clerk the Request for Summary Disposition of an Uncontested divorce filed on August 7, 1998. On February 20, 2001, the court received the following additional documents: (1) Affidavit of Resident Witness filed on August 7, 1998; (2) Notice of Entry of Decree of Divorce filed on August 26, 1998; and (3) Decree of Divorce entered on August 21, 1998. The documents were erroneously filed in Docket No. 37082. Please be informed that copies of these documents have also been filed in Vaile v. Eighth District Court, Docket No. 36969. Nos. 36969/37082 (cases are not consolidated.) | | |
03/07/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 16, 2001. | | 01-04145 |
04/18/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 11, 2001. | | 01-06660 |
06/13/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 10, 2001. | | 01-09930 |
09/13/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 24, 2001. | | 01-15491 |
09/27/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 13, 2001. | | 01-16273 |
10/01/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 13, 2001. | | 01-16493 |
12/26/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 7, 2002. | | 01-21724 |
01/10/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 02-00737 |
01/10/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | | |
01/24/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). | | 02-01634 |
02/07/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. | | 02-02472 |
02/14/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. R. Scotlund Vaile hereby substitutes Peter M. Angulo as his counsel in the place and stead of Joseph F. Dempsey | | 02-02991 |
03/12/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. | | 02-04456 |
04/09/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Strike "Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule" or in the Alternative, Motion for Permission to File Reply. | | 02-06302 |
04/29/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | | 02-07520 |
09/04/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's February 7, 2002, motion to suspend briefing as well as appellant's April 9, 2002, motion to strike respondent's opposition to the February 7, 2002, motion or alternatively for permission to file a reply to the opposition. NRAP 42(b). NNP02-MS/RR/NB | | 02-15226 |
09/04/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | | |