Case Information: 34076 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE HARBOR COVE LITIGATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A307599 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/30/1999 / Christensen, Carl | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nevada Power Company--check no. 1189. | ||
04/22/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-03151 | |
04/30/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
05/11/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: 5/7/99). | 99-03792 | |
06/24/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 99-05536 | |
06/24/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 99-05537 | |
07/07/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 99-05994 | |
07/07/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |