Case Information: 34045 | |||
Short Caption: | HUGHES (BRIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3048 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 10/10/2000 at 11:00 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 10/10/2000 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 99-02916 | |
04/29/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 11/23/98 and 11/24/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Cecily Krawczyk. | 99-03449 | |
05/11/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: May 17, 1999. | 99-03772 | |
05/19/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. | 99-04096 | |
05/24/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. On May 19, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix received on May 19, 1999. | 99-04253 | |
05/24/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Appendix, Volume 1 attached to the Fast Track Statement. | 99-04097 | |
05/24/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 2 - transcripts. | 99-04098 | |
06/15/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: June 21, 1999. | 99-05153 | |
06/23/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Mailed on 6/21/99. | 99-05480 | |
08/13/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Schedule. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days after the date of this order. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. fn2[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal]. | 99-07516 | |
09/24/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 25, 1999. | 99-09126 | |
10/25/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/23/99. | 99-10401 | |
12/02/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 29, 1999. | 99-12054 | |
01/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-00008 | |
01/06/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file the answering brief. | 00-00183 | |
01/18/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 1/13/00. | 00-00745 | |
01/18/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 00-00747 | |
02/14/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 15, 2000. | 00-02287 | |
04/17/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-06136 | |
04/17/2000 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. Mailed on: April 15, 2000. | 00-06137 | |
04/20/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The reply brief provisionally submitted on April 17, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. | 00-06362 | |
04/20/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 00-06137 | |
08/28/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 10, 2000 at 11:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML) | ||
09/21/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
10/10/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel: NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. | ||
11/22/2000 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. By the Court, Leavitt, J. We concur: Shearing, J. and Agosti, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 105. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-20496 | |
12/19/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-20754 | |
12/19/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2000. | 00-20754 |