Case Heading (S-18-0157) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0157 | Case Docketed On: | 07/02/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | ARIKA LYNN WALLACE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | ARIKA LYNN WALLACE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Arika Lynn Wallace | John H. Robinson |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sentencing |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
07/02/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
07/02/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
07/02/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/15/2018 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
08/16/2018 | Order Granting, in Part, Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
08/20/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Brief Deadline | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/10/2018 | Brief - Appellant (with appendix uploaded) | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
09/10/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Deficient Brief/Appendix | Notice-Outgoing | Deficient Brief/Appendix | Final | |
09/13/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief with Appendix (Appendix uploaded to brief filed on 9/10/18) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/25/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
10/25/2018 | Motion - Other (Stipulated Modification of the Record) | Motion | Other | Final | |
10/29/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; Stipulated Modification of the Record; and received copy of designation of the record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/05/2018 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
11/06/2018 | Order Granting Request to Supplement the Record (Documents attached to Stipulated Modification of the Record considered part of appellate record) | Order | Grant | Final | |
11/08/2018 | Event - Phone Call to Connie with the Clerk of the District Court's Office. She will supplement the record with certified copies of the documents attached to the Stipulated Modification of the Record and make another "supplemental volume" containing the Stipulated Modification of the Record; certified copies of attachments; and the Order Granting Request to Supplement the Record. She will also amend her index. She will send that supplemental volume after request for the record is received. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
11/13/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/15/2018 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
11/19/2018 | Correspondence - Incoming from the Clerk of the District Court advising that Appellant's counsel failed to file a designation of record | Correspondence | Incoming | Final | |
11/20/2018 | Order - Sanction - designation of record | Order | Sanction - designation of record | Final | |
11/20/2018 | Event - Phone Call - from John Robinson. The parties intend to move for voluntary dismissal. Mr. Robinson is awaiting receipt of waiver from Appellant. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
11/26/2018 | Fees - Sanctions received - designation | Fees | Sanctions received - designation | Final | |
11/26/2018 | Event - Phone Call to Connie at the District Court Clerk's Office. Told her to hold off on sending the record to us as Mr. Robinson has indicated that he plans to voluntarily dismiss this case. She told me that Mr. Robinson hadn't filed a designation yet, and I told her that was probably why. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
12/10/2018 | Event - Phone Call to Appellant's counsel - Linda said she was going to file the appellant's waiver of appeal with Motion to Dismiss. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
12/10/2018 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Final | |
12/17/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/17/2018 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
12/17/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |