judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1492
B-1492
04/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
DONALD M. PRICHARD, ET UX.
GULF COAST INVESTMENT CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1969Letter brief Respondent
06/05/1969Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/25/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/03/1969Opinion issued
06/24/1969Letter brief
06/05/1969Brief on the Merits
04/25/1969Response to Petition
04/17/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gulf Coast Investment CorporationRespondent
Douglas A. BarnesAmicus Curiae
Donald M. Prichard, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information