Case Heading (S-20-0084) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0084 | Case Docketed On: | 04/16/2020 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Uinta County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | FERNANDO GUTIERREZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | FERNANDO GUTIERREZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Fernando Gutierrez | Diane M. Lozano Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bridget L. Hill Jenny Lynn Craig Joshua Charles Eames Darrell Duane Jackson Ciara Slife |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2020 WY 150 |
Citation: | 477 P.3d 528 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/16/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/16/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/16/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/03/2020 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/05/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Appellant's Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
06/25/2020 | Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleading - Judgment and Sentence Nunc Pro Tunc, filed June 19, 2020 | Notice-Incoming | District Court Pleading | Final | |
07/17/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Ciara Slife | Notice-Incoming | Consent and Approval | Final | |
07/17/2020 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
07/20/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Notice of case maturity | Notice-Outgoing | Notice of case maturity | Final | |
07/20/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Appellee's Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
08/04/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/04/2020 | Order - Oral argument scheduled at 10:10 AM | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
08/10/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Joshua C. Eames for Ciara Slife obo appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
08/11/2020 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume 1, Original Papers; Volume 2, Confidential Folder; Volume 3, Transcripts - 2. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/11/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Kirk A. Morgan obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/23/2020 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Kirk Morgan obo Appellant; Joshua Eames and Ciara Slife (student), argument by Ms. Slife obo Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
12/16/2020 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Justice Fox writing for the Court. Justice Kautz files a specially concurring opinion. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
01/04/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
01/04/2021 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
01/04/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
01/04/2021 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/11/2021 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/7/21 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |