Case: 14-97-01235-CR
14-97-01235-CR
11/03/1997
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Cameron, Joseph Keith
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/02/1998 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | | |
05/26/1998 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/31/2000 | Case stored | | |
07/20/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/20/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/14/2000 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
07/13/2000 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |
06/21/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
03/29/2000 | Record Sent | | |
03/22/2000 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
02/29/2000 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
02/28/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
02/28/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
02/11/2000 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
02/11/2000 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
01/27/2000 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
01/27/2000 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
07/01/1999 | Submitted | | |
07/01/1999 | Submission | | |
07/01/1999 | Submitted | | |
11/20/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/20/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/20/1998 | State's brief DUE | | |
11/20/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/15/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/07/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/06/1998 | State's brief DUE | | |
09/03/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/24/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/23/1998 | State's brief DUE | | |
07/16/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
07/10/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/09/1998 | State's brief DUE | | |
06/09/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
06/09/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/02/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
06/02/1998 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | | |
05/26/1998 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | | |
05/22/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
04/16/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
04/08/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
04/07/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/19/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
03/09/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
03/09/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/12/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/04/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/29/1998 | Past due brief | | |
01/22/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/27/1997 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
12/23/1997 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |
11/20/1997 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
11/13/1997 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
11/13/1997 | Record due | | |
11/12/1997 | Extend time to file court reporter record FILED | | |
11/03/1997 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
11/03/1997 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
11/03/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/13/1997 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
07/15/1997 | Date of Sentence | | |
07/15/1997 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/20/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Richard H. Branson B. Warren Goodson, Jr. |
CAMERON, KEITH JOSEPH | Criminal - Appellant | Robert A. Monks |
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
96CR0844
3 yrs. tdc.