Case Heading (S-20-0085) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0085 | Case Docketed On: | 04/16/2020 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Uinta County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34) | ||
Short Title: | BART WILLIAM SMITH and UINTA BANK, a Wyoming state banking corporation v. ROY HOUSE | ||||
Full Title: | BART WILLIAM SMITH and UINTA BANK, a Wyoming state banking corporation, Appellants (Defendants), v. ROY HOUSE, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Bart William Smith | James R. Salisbury |
Appellant | Uinta Bank, a Wyoming state banking corporation | James R. Salisbury |
Appellee | Roy House | Mark W Harris |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/16/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/16/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/16/2020 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/16/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
05/29/2020 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
05/29/2020 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
07/01/2020 | Motion - Extension of time - brief (second request, unopposed) | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
07/01/2020 | Order - Grant - extension of time (second) | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
07/15/2020 | Appellants' Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to File Initial Brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
07/15/2020 | Order Granting Appellant's (third) Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - third extension of time | Final | |
07/27/2020 | Motion - Dismiss - stipulated | Motion | Dismiss - stipulated | Final | |
07/27/2020 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
07/27/2020 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |