judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Rainbow Gifts, Inc. v. Janice Woods d/b/a Unique Collections by Janice

Case: 09-00-00572-CV
09-00-00572-CV
12/28/2000
Contract
Rainbow Gifts, Inc.
Janice Woods d/b/a Unique Collections by Janice
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
05/01/2001Case stored
05/01/2001Mandate Issued
02/15/2001Order disposing of a caseDismissed
02/02/2001Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/04/2001Clerks Record Filed
12/28/2000Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/01/2001Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Woods, JaniceAppelleeSusan J. Oliver
Rainbow Gifts, Inc.AppellantMarc Henry
Trial Court Information
60th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
B-162221-A