Case: 97-1042
97-1042
11/07/1997
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
STARR COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT and STARR COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD
VALERO SOUTH TEXAS GATHERING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/21/1997 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/07/1997 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/10/1998 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | 11/07/97 1 copy of petition | | |
03/10/1998 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
01/16/1998 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | Petition for review denied. | |
11/25/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/21/1997 | Response to Petition | | | |
11/07/1997 | Petition for Review | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/10/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 30B5 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STARR COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRIC | Petitioner | Mr. James R. Evans Jr. Ms. Sandra Minderhout Griffin |
VALERO SOUTH TEXAS GATHERING | Respondent | Mr. Dan Dennis Hartnett Mr. Frank R. Nye Jr. Mr. Robert J. Myers Mr. William H. Robison |
STARR COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEW | Petitioner | Mr. Russell R. Graham |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-96-00526-CV
Reversed & Remanded
RULE 90, 09-24-97
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable TOM RICKHOFF
Trial Court Information
229th District Court
Starr
Honorable Ricardo Garcia
9874