Case Information: 38983 | |||
Short Caption: | HILBERT VS. SAMPSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0003414 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/09/2002 / Shipman, Madelyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/26/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Barber, Klearman & Associates--check no. 15965. | ||
12/26/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-21691 | |
01/09/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/05/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, appellants have failed to file the docketing statement. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to the Barber firm and the Robison firm, counsel for appellants). | 02-03974 | |
03/11/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellants Shawn Hilbert and Kelly Hilbert. | 02-04387 | |
03/13/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Madelyn Shipman (Docketing statement) | ||
06/10/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 11, 2002. | 02-10064 | |
07/18/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 02-12308 | |
07/22/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 02-12512 | |
07/31/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On July 18, 2002, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellant's notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal and, cause appearing, the motion is granted and " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 02-13111 | |
07/31/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |