judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY OF LAS VEGAS VS. WASHINGTON

Case Information: 34034
Short Caption:CITY OF LAS VEGAS VS. WASHINGTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388129Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/19/1999 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Returned check no. 1715 in the amount of $200 to Gugino & Schwartz.
04/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-02782
04/19/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/26/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-03249
05/20/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Robinson. This matter was settled without a conference. 99-04173
05/28/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-04449
05/28/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Stipulation for Dismissal. 99-04450
06/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-05301
06/18/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.