judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TRUITT, SUZANNE REIER EVANGEL TEMPLE INC.

Case Information: 84-CV-0275
Short Caption:TRUITT, SUZANNE REIER EVANGEL TEMPLE INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA6606-80Filed Date:02/13/1984

Opening Event Date:02/13/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/04/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/10/1984
Argued/Submitted:10/09/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert N. LevinYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael A. Schuchat YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TRUITT, SUZANNE REIER ET AL EVANGEL TEMPLE INC.
02/13/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/04/1984FiledRecord Completed
07/10/1984FiledBriefing Completed
10/09/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/11/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition