Case Heading (S-18-0070) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0070 | Case Docketed On: | 03/12/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29) | ||
Short Title: | TERRANCE M. TUTTLE v. DEBRA K. LEE, in her official capacity as Laramie County Clerk | ||||
Full Title: | TERRANCE M. TUTTLE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DEBRA K. LEE, in her official capacity as Laramie County Clerk, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Terrance M. Tuttle | Pro Se |
Appellee | Debra K. Lee | Jon Mark Stewart |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Civil Procedure, Taxation |
Opinion Number: | 2018 WY 104 |
Citation: | 425 P.3d 998 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/12/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/12/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/12/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
03/12/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/13/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/13/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief; and received copy of designation of record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/18/2018 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
06/27/2018 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
06/28/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/03/2018 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
07/10/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume 1 - Original papers; Volume 2 - Transcript (1) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/05/2018 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Chief Justice Davis writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
09/21/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
09/21/2018 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
09/21/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
09/21/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
09/26/2018 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/25/2018 by Diane Sanchez | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |