Case: 98-1187
98-1187
12/01/1998
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
LARRY GENTRY and LGA INC.
HUEL H. WEAVER JR. STEVE SCHIFF individually and as representative of the ESTATE OF H.G. SCHIFF GORDON G. TUCKER FRED E. TUCKER JR. and AMHGS INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/01/1999 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of Huel H. Weaver, Jr., Steve Schiff, Estate of H. G. Schiff, Gordon G. Tucker, Jr., & Amhgs, Inc. | |
12/01/1998 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/24/1999 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | order sent to COA | | |
05/20/1999 | Case Stored | | | |
03/25/1999 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
03/01/1999 | Response to Petition | On behalf of Huel H. Weaver, Jr., Steve Schiff, Estate of H. G. Schiff, Gordon G. Tucker, Jr., & Amhgs, Inc. | | |
02/01/1999 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due 03/01/99; NO FILING FEE | | |
01/05/1999 | Case forwarded to Court | forwarded to conference | | |
01/04/1999 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Huel Weaver, Jr. Steve Schiff, estate of H.G. Schiff, estate of Gordon Tucker, estate of Fred Tucker and AMHGS | | |
12/01/1998 | Appendix to any instrument | (attached to petition) | | |
12/01/1998 | Petition for Review | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/20/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 17-I-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WEAVER, JR., HUEL H. | Respondent | Mr. Dan S. Boyd |
ESTATE OF GORDON G. TUCKER | Respondent | Mr. Dan S. Boyd |
ESTATE OF FRED E. TUCKER, JR. | Respondent | Mr. Dan S. Boyd |
LGA, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Michael J. Quilling |
AMHGS, INC. | Respondent | Ms. Cecilia Ackels Martin |
GENTRY, LARRY | Petitioner | Mr. Arthur F. Selander Mr. Robert Scott Luttrull |
SCHIFF, STEVE | Respondent | Mr. Dan S. Boyd |
ESTATE OF H.G. SCHIFF | Respondent | Mr. Dan S. Boyd |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-96-01605-CV
Aff/Rev'd & Remanded
RULE 47.7, 10-14-98
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOSEPH B. MORRIS
Trial Court Information
14th District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M. Marshall
95-06695-A