judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2916
A-2916
11/10/1950
Application for Writ of Error
KENDALL ROBINSON
V.T. GLENN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/27/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/25/1951Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
11/20/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
11/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/1951Response to Motion filed
04/04/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/21/1951Opinion issued
01/27/1951Brief on the Merits
01/25/1951Brief on the Merits
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
11/20/1950Response to Petition
11/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
V.T. Glenn, et al.Respondent
Kendall RobinsonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information