judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2936
A-2936
11/29/1950
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS EX REL. J. H. CHILDRESS
COUNTY SCHOOL TRUSTEE OF SHELBY COUNTY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/15/1951Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/31/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/09/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
04/18/1951Opinion issued
02/15/1951Response to Brief filed
01/31/1951Supplemental Brief filed
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
12/09/1950Response to Petition
11/29/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/29/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas ex rel. J. H. ChildressPetitioner
County School Trustee of Shelby County, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information