Case Heading (S-18-0065) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0065 | Case Docketed On: | 03/09/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34) | ||
Short Title: | KENT J. NICHOLS and DIANE H. NICHOLS v. ANTHONY S. AQUILA and SHELLY AQUILA | ||||
Full Title: | KENT J. NICHOLS and DIANE H. NICHOLS, Appellants (Defendants), v. ANTHONY S. AQUILA and SHELLY AQUILA, Appellees (Plaintiffs). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Kent J. Nichols | Gerard R. Bosch |
Appellant | Diane H. Nichols | Gerard R. Bosch |
Appellee | Anthony S. Aquila | John A. Masterson Alaina M. Stedillie Christopher H. Hawks |
Appellee | Shelly Aquila | John A. Masterson Alaina M. Stedillie Christopher H. Hawks |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/09/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/09/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/09/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
03/09/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/14/2018 | Motion - Stay briefing - unopposed | Motion | Stay briefing - unopposed | Final | |
03/23/2018 | Event - Phone Call to Mr. Bosch regarding hard copies of motion to stay. He thought he had mailed them, but will sign another "original" and send as he is leaving for an extended vacation. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/27/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed Motion to Stay | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/27/2018 | Order Dismissing Appeal | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
04/12/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |